Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB508 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/15/2023

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 508
 (In the Senate - Filed January 19, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 15, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 15, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of the portion of Farm-to-Market Road
 765 in Concho County as the Sergeant Stephen Jones Memorial
 Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.216 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.216.  SERGEANT STEPHEN JONES MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.  (a)
 The portion of Farm-to-Market Road 765 in Concho County is
 designated as the Sergeant Stephen Jones Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Sergeant Stephen Jones Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *