Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB533 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/05/2023

                    By: Paxton S.B. No. 533
 (In the Senate - Filed January 20, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 5, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 5, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to training for peace officers on responding to and
 investigating child fatalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.253, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (q) to read as follows:
 (q)  As part of the minimum curriculum requirements, the
 commission shall require an officer to complete a training program
 on responding to and investigating child fatalities, including the
 protocols for reporting and investigating child fatalities
 developed under Subchapter F, Chapter 264, Family Code, the
 differences between sudden unexpected infant death and sudden
 infant death syndrome, and the relevant regulations applicable to
 child-care facilities.  An officer shall complete the program not
 later than the second anniversary of the date the officer is
 licensed under this chapter unless the officer completes the
 program as part of the officer's basic training course.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2024, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall establish the training program
 required by Section 1701.253(q), Occupations Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1701.253(q), Occupations Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to a person who submits an application for
 a peace officer license under Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, on or
 after January 1, 2024.  A person who submits an application for a
 peace officer license under Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, before
 January 1, 2024, is governed by the law in effect immediately before
 the effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *