Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB544 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 544


 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of a temporary teaching certificate to and
 requirements regarding educator certification for certain persons
 with experience as instructors for the Community College of the Air
 Force.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.0525 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.0525.  CERTIFICATION OF CERTAIN MILITARY
 INSTRUCTORS; TEMPORARY TEACHING CERTIFICATE.  (a)  The board shall
 propose rules providing for a person who holds a bachelor's degree
 and has at least two semesters' experience as a full-time
 instructor for the Community College of the Air Force to:
 (1)  be issued a temporary teaching certificate on the
 person's enrollment in an educator preparation program; and
 (2)  receive credit for the person's education,
 training, and clinical or professional experience as an instructor
 for the Community College of the Air Force toward the requirements
 for completion of an educator preparation program, including
 requirements regarding coursework, field-based experience, or
 clinical experience.
 (b)  A temporary teaching certificate issued under this
 section is valid for a term of one year from the date of issuance.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 544 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 544 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 138,
 Nays 5, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor