Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB544 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/11/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Blanco, Gutierrez S.B. No. 544
 (In the Senate - Filed January 20, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 11, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 12, Nays 0; April 11, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 544 By:  Flores


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of a temporary teaching certificate to and
 requirements regarding educator certification for certain persons
 with experience as instructors for the Community College of the Air
 Force.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.0525 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.0525.  CERTIFICATION OF CERTAIN MILITARY
 INSTRUCTORS; TEMPORARY TEACHING CERTIFICATE.  (a)  The board shall
 propose rules providing for a person who has at least two semesters'
 experience as a full-time instructor for the Community College of
 the Air Force to:
 (1)  be issued a temporary teaching certificate on the
 person's enrollment in an educator preparation program; and
 (2)  receive credit for the person's education,
 training, and clinical or professional experience as an instructor
 for the Community College of the Air Force toward the requirements
 for completion of an educator preparation program, including
 requirements regarding coursework, field-based experience, or
 clinical experience.
 (b)  A temporary teaching certificate issued under this
 section is valid for a term of one year from the date of issuance.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *