Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB560 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/16/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Springer S.B. No. 560
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 May 16, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 560 By:  Parker


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the time for processing a municipal building permit
 application.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 214.904, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (b) and (d) and adding Subsections
 (e)  and (f) to read as follows:
 (b)  Not later than the 45th day after the date an
 application for a permit is submitted, the municipality must:
 (1)  grant or deny the permit;
 (2)  provide written notice to the applicant stating
 the reasons why the municipality has been unable to grant or deny
 the permit application in the time required by this subsection; or
 (3)  for a commercial building permit only, reach a
 written agreement with the applicant providing for a deadline for
 granting or denying the permit.
 (d)  If a municipality fails to comply with this section
 [grant or deny a permit application in the time required by
 Subsection (c) or by an agreement under Subsection (b)(3)], the
 municipality:
 (1)  may not collect any permit fees associated with
 the application; and
 (2)  shall refund to the applicant any permit fees
 associated with the application that have been collected.
 (e)  A municipality may not:
 (1)  deny a permit solely because the municipality is
 unable to comply with this section; or
 (2)  require an applicant to waive the requirements of
 this section.
 (f)  In this section, "commercial" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 214.211.
 SECTION 2.  Section 214.904, Local Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to a municipal building permit
 application that is submitted on or after the effective date of this
 Act. An application submitted before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect on the date the application was
 submitted, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *