Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB576 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/03/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 576
 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 3, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 3, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 576 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting, investigation, and prosecution of the
 criminal offense of financial abuse of an elderly individual.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 48.1522(a), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), if during the
 course of the department's or another state agency's investigation
 of reported abuse, neglect, or exploitation, including an
 investigation of reported abuse, neglect, or exploitation under
 Subchapter F, a caseworker of the department or other state agency,
 as applicable, or the caseworker's supervisor has cause to believe
 that the elderly person or person with a disability has been abused,
 neglected, or exploited by another person in a manner that
 constitutes a criminal offense under any law, including Sections
 [Section] 22.04 and 32.55, Penal Code, the caseworker or supervisor
 shall:
 (1)  immediately notify an appropriate law enforcement
 agency, unless the law enforcement agency reported the alleged
 abuse, neglect, or exploitation to the department; and
 (2)  provide the law enforcement agency with a copy of
 the investigation report of the department or other state agency,
 as applicable, in a timely manner.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 48, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 48.2535 to read as follows:
 Sec. 48.2535.  FORWARDING CERTAIN REPORTS OF CRIMINAL
 CONDUCT TO LAW ENFORCEMENT. On receipt by the department of a
 report of alleged abuse or exploitation under this subchapter that
 the department believes constitutes an offense under Section 32.55,
 Penal Code, the department shall immediately notify an appropriate
 law enforcement agency, regardless of whether the report alleges
 conduct that constitutes abuse or exploitation for purposes of this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  Section 32.55, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  There is a rebuttable presumption that any transfer,
 appropriation, or use of an elderly individual's money or other
 property by a person described by Subsection (b)(5) constitutes
 conduct in violation of this section if it is shown on the trial of
 the offense that the actor knew or should have known that, at the
 time of the offense, the elderly individual had been diagnosed with
 dementia, Alzheimer's disease, or a related disorder.
 SECTION 4.  Section 48.2535, Human Resources Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to a report received by the Department of
 Family and Protective Services on or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 5.  Section 32.55(f), Penal Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to an offense committed on or after the effective
 date of this Act. An offense committed before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was
 committed, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose. For purposes of this section, an offense was committed
 before the effective date of this Act if any element of the offense
 occurred before that date.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *