Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB580 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/29/2023

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 580
 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 March 29, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 29, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain counties to cancel platted
 subdivisions that have remained undeveloped.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 232.0085(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to real property that
 [located]:
 (1)  [outside municipalities and the extraterritorial
 jurisdiction of municipalities, as determined under Chapter 42; and
 [(2)] is located in the unincorporated area of an
 affected county, as defined by Section 16.341, Water Code, that:
 (A)  has adopted the model rules developed under
 Section 16.343, Water Code;[,] and
 (B)  is located along an international border; and
 (2)  if the area is located in the extraterritorial
 jurisdiction of a municipality, is not subject to a written
 agreement under Section 242.001 that authorizes the municipality to
 regulate subdivision plats and approve related permits in the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *