Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB621 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/16/2023

                    By: Parker S.B. No. 621
 (In the Senate - Filed January 26, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 16, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; March 16, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 621 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the position of chief information security officer in
 the Department of Information Resources.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter N-1, Chapter 2054, Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 2054.510 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.510.  CHIEF INFORMATION SECURITY OFFICER. (a) In
 this section, "state information security program" means the
 policies, standards, procedures, elements, structure, strategies,
 objectives, plans, metrics, reports, services, and resources that
 establish the information resources security function for this
 state.
 (b)  The executive director, using existing funds, shall
 employ a chief information security officer.
 (c)  The chief information security officer shall oversee
 cybersecurity matters for this state including:
 (1)  implementing the duties described by Section
 2054.059;
 (2)  responding to reports received under Section
 2054.1125;
 (3)  developing a statewide information security
 framework;
 (4)  overseeing the development of statewide
 information security policies and standards;
 (5)  developing, in coordination with state agencies,
 local governmental entities, and other entities operating or
 exercising control over state information systems or
 state-controlled data, information security policies, standards,
 and guidelines to strengthen this state's cybersecurity;
 (6)  overseeing the implementation of the policies,
 standards, and guidelines developed under Subdivisions (3), (4),
 and (5);
 (7)  providing information security leadership,
 strategic direction, and coordination for the state information
 security program;
 (8)  providing strategic direction to:
 (A)  the network security center established
 under Section 2059.101; and
 (B)  statewide technology centers operated under
 Subchapter L; and
 (9)  overseeing the preparation and submission of the
 report described by Section 2054.0591.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *