Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB627 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2023

                    S.B. No. 627


 AN ACT
 relating to the entitlement of certain municipalities to certain
 tax revenue related to a hotel and convention center project.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.153(a), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to a municipality described by
 Section 351.152(5), (6), [351.152(6)] or (29).
 SECTION 2.  Sections 351.157(a), (b), and (c), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "qualified establishment" means an
 establishment:
 (1)  that is located on land:
 (A)  owned by a municipality; or
 (B)  owned by:
 (i)  any person if the establishment is
 located in a municipality described by Section 351.152(3); [or]
 (ii) [owned by] the federal government if the
 establishment is located in a municipality described by Section
 351.152(6); or
 (iii)  a nonprofit corporation, including a
 public facility corporation, that is acting as or on behalf of, or
 that is controlled by, a municipality, if the establishment is
 located in a municipality described by Section 351.152(5);
 (2)  the nearest exterior wall of which is located not
 more than 1,000 feet from the nearest exterior wall of a qualified
 hotel or qualified convention center facility;
 (3)  that is constructed:
 (A)  on or after the date the municipality
 commences a qualified project under this subchapter; or
 (B)  at any time if the establishment is located
 in a municipality described by Section 351.152(3);
 (4)  that is not a sports stadium; and
 (5)  that is the type of establishment described by
 Subsection (c) from which the municipality is entitled to receive
 revenue under Subsection (d).
 (b)  This section applies only to:
 (1)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(3);
 (1-a)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(5);
 (2)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(6);
 (3)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(7);
 (4)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(10);
 (4-a)  a municipality described by Section
 351.152(14);
 (5)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(16);
 (6)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(22);
 (7)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(25);
 (8)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(34);
 (9)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(35);
 (10)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(36);
 (11)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(38);
 and
 (12)  a municipality described by Section 351.152(43).
 (c)  A municipality is entitled to receive revenue under
 Subsection (d) derived from the following types of establishments
 that meet the requirements of Subsections (a)(1), (2), (3), and
 (4):
 (1)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(1):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel;
 (1-a)  for a municipality described by Subsection
 (b)(1-a):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, spas, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel;
 (2)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(2),
 swimming pools and swimming facilities, restaurants, bars, and
 retail establishments;
 (3)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(3),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (4)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(4):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel;
 (4-a)  for a municipality described by Subsection
 (b)(4-a):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel;
 (5)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(5),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (6)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(6),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (7)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(7),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (8)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(8),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (9)  for a municipality described by Subsection (b)(9),
 restaurants, bars, and retail establishments;
 (10)  for a municipality described by Subsection
 (b)(10):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel;
 (11)  for a municipality described by Subsection
 (b)(11):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel; and
 (12)  for a municipality described by Subsection
 (b)(12):
 (A)  restaurants, bars, and retail
 establishments; and
 (B)  swimming pools and swimming facilities owned
 or operated by the related qualified hotel.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter C, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 351.161 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.161.  RECAPTURE OF LOST STATE TAX REVENUE FROM
 CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES. (a) This section applies only to a
 municipality described by Section 351.152(5).
 (b)  On the 20th anniversary of the date a hotel designated
 as a qualified hotel by a municipality to which this section applies
 is open for initial occupancy, the comptroller shall determine:
 (1)  the total amount of state tax revenue received
 under Sections 351.156 and 351.157 by the municipality from the
 qualified project of which the qualified hotel was a part during the
 period for which the municipality was entitled to receive that
 revenue; and
 (2)  the total amount of state tax revenue described by
 Sections 351.156 and 351.157 received by the state during the
 period beginning on the 10th anniversary of the date the qualified
 hotel opened for initial occupancy and ending on the 20th
 anniversary of that date from the same sources from which the
 municipality received revenue under Section 351.156 or 351.157.
 (c)  If the amount determined under Subsection (b)(1)
 exceeds the amount determined under Subsection (b)(2), the
 comptroller shall promptly provide written notice to the
 municipality stating that the municipality must remit to the
 comptroller the difference between those two amounts in the manner
 provided by this subsection.  The municipality shall, using money
 lawfully available to the municipality for the purpose, remit
 monthly payments to the comptroller in an amount equal to the total
 amount of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue received by the
 municipality from the qualified hotel in the preceding month until
 the amount remitted to the comptroller equals the total amount due
 as stated in the notice.  The first payment required under this
 subsection must be made not later than the 30th day after the date
 the municipality receives the notice from the comptroller.
 Subsequent payments are due on the 20th day of each month until the
 total amount stated in the notice is paid.  The comptroller shall
 prescribe the procedure a municipality must use to remit a payment
 required by this subsection to the comptroller.
 (d)  The comptroller shall deposit revenue received under
 this section in the manner prescribed by Section 156.251.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 627 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 22, Nays 7; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 7.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 627 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 108,
 Nays 34, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor