Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB638 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Springer S.B. No. 638
 (In the Senate - Filed January 26, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture &
 Rural Affairs; April 17, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 638 By:  Springer


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedures for acting on a permit or permit
 amendment application by a groundwater conservation district and
 the disqualification of board members of groundwater conservation
 districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.053, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 36.053.  QUORUM. (a)  Except as provided by Subsection
 (b), a [A] majority of the membership of the board constitutes a
 quorum for any meeting, and a concurrence of a majority of the
 entire membership of the board is sufficient for transacting any
 business of the district.
 (b)  For the purposes of making a final decision on a permit
 or permit amendment application by a board composed of 10 or more
 directors, a concurrence of a majority of the directors eligible to
 vote is sufficient for taking an action on the application.
 SECTION 2.  Section 36.058, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 36.058.  CONFLICTS OF INTEREST.  (a)  A director of a
 district is subject to the provisions of Chapters 171 and 176, Local
 Government Code, relating to the regulation of conflicts of
 officers of local governments.
 (b)  If a director is required to file an affidavit under
 Section 171.004(a), Local Government Code, the director may not:
 (1)  attend a closed meeting related to the matter for
 which the director is required to file the affidavit; and
 (2)  vote on a matter for which the director is required
 to file the affidavit unless a majority of the directors are also
 required to file an affidavit related to a similar interest on the
 same official action.
 SECTION 3.  Section 36.409, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 36.409.  CONTINUANCE. (a) The presiding officer may
 continue a hearing from time to time and from place to place without
 providing notice under Section 36.404.
 (b)  If the presiding officer continues a hearing without
 announcing at the hearing the time, date, and location of the
 continued hearing, the presiding officer must provide notice of the
 continued hearing by regular mail to the parties.
 (c)  A continuance may not exceed the time limit for the
 issuance of a final decision under Section 36.4165.
 SECTION 4.  Section 36.411, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 36.411.  BOARD ACTION.  (a) The board shall act on a
 permit or permit amendment application not later than the 60th day
 after the date the final hearing on the application is concluded.
 (b)  The board shall ensure a decision on a permit or permit
 amendment application is timely rendered in accordance with the
 provisions set forth in this chapter.
 SECTION 5.  The heading to Section 36.412, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 36.412.  REQUEST FOR REHEARING OR FINDINGS OF FACT AND
 CONCLUSIONS OF LAW.
 SECTION 6.  Section 36.412, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections (a-1),
 (b-1), and (f) to read as follows:
 (a)  An applicant in a contested or uncontested hearing on an
 application or a party to a contested hearing may administratively
 appeal a decision of the board on a permit or permit amendment
 application by making a request in writing to the board.
 (a-1)  A party seeking to appeal a decision by the board must
 request [by requesting] written findings of fact and conclusions of
 law not later than the 20th day after the date of the board's
 decision unless the board issued findings of fact and conclusions
 of law as part of the final decision.
 (b)  On receipt of a timely written request under Subsection
 (a-1), the board shall make written findings of fact and
 conclusions of law regarding a decision of the board on a permit or
 permit amendment application. The board shall provide certified
 copies of the findings of fact and conclusions of law to the person
 who requested them, and to each designated party, not later than the
 35th day after the date the board receives the request.
 (b-1)  A party to a contested hearing may request a rehearing
 not later than the 20th day after the date the board issues the
 findings of fact and conclusions of law.
 (f)  The board shall consolidate requests for rehearing
 filed by multiple parties to the contested case hearing, but only
 one rehearing may be considered per matter.
 SECTION 7.  Section 36.4165, Water Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows:
 (c)  A final decision issued by the board under this section
 must be in writing and must either adopt the proposed findings of
 fact and conclusions of law as proposed by the administrative law
 judge or include revised findings of fact and conclusions of law
 consistent with Subsection (b).
 (d)  Notwithstanding any other law, a board shall issue a
 final decision under this section not later than the 180th day after
 the date of receipt of the final proposal for decision from the
 State Office of Administrative Hearings. The deadline may be
 extended if all parties agree to the extension.
 (e)  Notwithstanding any other law, if a motion for rehearing
 is filed and granted by a board under Section 36.412, the board
 shall make a final decision on the application not later than the
 90th day after the date of the decision by the board that was
 subject to the motion for rehearing.
 (f)  A board is considered to have adopted a final proposal
 for decision of the administrative law judge as a final order on the
 181st day after the date the administrative law judge issued the
 final proposal for decision if the board has not issued a final
 decision by:
 (1)  adopting the findings of fact and conclusions of
 law as proposed by the administrative law judge; or
 (2)  issuing revised findings of fact and conclusions
 of law as provided by Subsection (b).
 (g)  A proposal for decision adopted under Subsection (f) is
 final, immediately appealable, and not subject to a request for
 rehearing.
 SECTION 8.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to an
 application for a permit or permit amendment submitted on or after
 the effective date of this Act. An application for a permit or
 permit amendment submitted before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect at the time the application was
 submitted, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *