Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB68 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/06/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini, Springer S.B. No. 68
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2022; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 6, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; April 6, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to excused absences from public school for certain
 students to visit a professional's workplace for a career
 investigation day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.087, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-8) and amending Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (b-8)  A school district may excuse a student from attending
 school for a career investigation day to visit a professional at the
 professional's workplace during the student's junior and senior
 years of high school for the purpose of determining the student's
 interest in pursuing a career in the professional's field, provided
 that:
 (1)  the district may not excuse for this purpose more
 than two days during the student's junior year and two days during
 the student's senior year; and
 (2)  the district adopts:
 (A)  a policy to determine when an absence may be
 excused for this purpose; and
 (B)  a procedure to verify the student's visit at
 the professional's workplace.
 (d)  A student whose absence is excused under Subsection (b),
 (b-1), (b-2), (b-4), (b-5), (b-7), (b-8), or (c) may not be
 penalized for that absence and shall be counted as if the student
 attended school for purposes of calculating the average daily
 attendance of students in the school district. A student whose
 absence is excused under Subsection (b), (b-1), (b-2), (b-4),
 (b-5), (b-7), (b-8), or (c) shall be allowed a reasonable time to
 make up school work missed on those days. If the student
 satisfactorily completes the school work, the day of absence shall
 be counted as a day of compulsory attendance.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2023-2024
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *