Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB695 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

                    By: Hughes, Nichols S.B. No. 695
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Higher Education;
 April 17, 2023, reported favorably from Committee on Education by
 the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 17, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to funding for The University of Texas at Tyler's school of
 pharmacy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 76.026(c), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *