By: Eckhardt S.B. No. 699 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2023; February 17, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government; April 24, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 24, 2023, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the continuation of a health care provider participation program by a certain hospital district. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 298E.004, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 298E.004. EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section 298E.153(d), the authority of a district to administer and operate a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2027 [2023]. (b) This chapter expires December 31, 2027 [2023]. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. * * * * *