Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB739 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2023

                    By: Johnson S.B. No. 739
 (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2023; March 1, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Administration;
 March 30, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating October 10 as Supportive Palliative Care
 Awareness Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.081 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.081.  SUPPORTIVE PALLIATIVE CARE AWARENESS DAY.
 (a) October 10 is Supportive Palliative Care Awareness Day to raise
 awareness about supportive palliative care optimizing the quality
 of life for seriously ill patients and their families.
 (b)  Supportive Palliative Care Awareness Day may be
 regularly observed by appropriate ceremonies and activities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *