Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB760 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2023

                    By: LaMantia S.B. No. 760
 (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2023; March 1, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to taking a blood specimen from the body of a deceased
 person during an inquest.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 49.10(j), Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (j)  A justice of the peace may order a physician, qualified
 technician, paramedic, chemist, registered professional nurse, or
 licensed vocational nurse to take a specimen of blood from the body
 of a person:
 (1)  who died as the result of a motor vehicle accident
 if the justice determines that circumstances indicate that the
 person may have been driving while intoxicated; or
 (2)  to aid in the confirmation or determination of the
 cause and manner of death while conducting an inquest.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *