Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB785 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 785


 AN ACT
 relating to the ownership of and certain insurance policy
 provisions regarding the geothermal energy and associated
 resources below the surface of land.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2703.056, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2703.056.  EXCEPTIONS; MINERAL AND GEOTHERMAL ENERGY
 INTERESTS.  (a)  Subject to the underwriting standards of the title
 insurance company, a title insurance company may in a commitment
 for title insurance or a title insurance policy include a general
 exception or a special exception to except from coverage:
 (1)  a mineral estate or the geothermal energy and
 associated resources below the surface of the land; or
 (2)  an instrument that purports to reserve or transfer
 all or part of a mineral estate or the geothermal energy and
 associated resources below the surface of the land.
 (b)  A reduction to, or credit on a premium charge for, a
 policy of title insurance or other insuring form may not be directly
 or indirectly based on an exclusion of, or general or special
 exception to, a mineral estate or the geothermal energy and
 associated resources below the surface of the land in the title
 insurance policy.
 (c)  The inclusion in a title insurance policy of a general
 exception or a special exception described by Subsection (a) does
 not create title insurance coverage as to the condition or
 ownership of the mineral estate or the geothermal energy and
 associated resources below the surface of the land.
 SECTION 2.  Section 141.003(5), Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (5)  "By-product" means any other element found in a
 geothermal formation which is brought to the surface, whether or
 not it is used in geothermal heat or pressure inducing energy
 generation. The term does not include:
 (A)  a mineral, as defined by Section 75.001,
 Property Code; or
 (B)  oil, gas, or a product of oil or gas, as
 defined by Section 85.001.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 141, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 141.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 141.004.  OWNERSHIP OF GEOTHERMAL ENERGY AND ASSOCIATED
 RESOURCES. (a) Except as otherwise expressly provided by a
 conveyance, contract, deed, reservation, exception, limitation,
 lease, or other binding obligation, the geothermal energy and
 associated resources below the surface of land are owned as real
 property by:
 (1)  the landowner; or
 (2)  if the surface estate and the mineral estate of the
 land have been severed, the owner of the surface estate of the land.
 (b)  Subject to the provisions of this chapter, the property
 rights described by this section entitle the owner of the
 geothermal energy and associated resources below the surface of
 land and the owner's lessee, heir, or assignee to drill for and
 produce the geothermal energy and associated resources.
 (c)  This section does not:
 (1)  apply to minerals dissolved or otherwise contained
 in groundwater, including in hot brines; or
 (2)  change existing law regarding:
 (A)  oil, gas, or mineral extraction regardless of
 its heat or energy potential;
 (B)  the rights of the dominant and servient
 estates; or
 (C)  the ownership and use of groundwater.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 785 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 785 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor