Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB798 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/30/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Middleton S.B. No. 798
 (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2023; March 1, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; March 30, 2023,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 2;
 March 30, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the certification requirements for a public school
 counselor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.0462 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.0462.  QUALIFICATIONS FOR CERTIFICATION AS SCHOOL
 COUNSELOR. The qualifications for certification as a school
 counselor may not include a requirement that a candidate for
 certification have experience as a classroom teacher.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as possible after the effective date of
 this Act but not later than January 1, 2024, the State Board for
 Educator Certification shall propose any rules necessary to
 implement Section 21.0462, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *