Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB833 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/24/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 833


 AN ACT
 relating to consideration by insurers of certain prohibited
 criteria for ratemaking.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 5, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 565 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 565.  PROHIBITED RATING CRITERIA
 Sec. 565.001.  PURPOSE. (a)  The purpose of this chapter is
 to regulate the use of environmental, social, or governance models,
 scores, factors, or standards to define acts or practices that may
 be unfair discrimination in the business of insurance in this
 state.
 (b)  The legislature finds that there are numerous entities
 that have developed different environmental, social, or governance
 models, scores, factors, or standards that are used to:
 (1)  evaluate financial risks for investments in
 certain businesses or industries; or
 (2)  encourage or discourage business dealings or
 investments with certain types of businesses or industries.
 (c)  To the extent that the use of such models, scores,
 factors, or standards are not based on sound actuarial principles,
 or do not bear a reasonable relationship to the expected loss and
 expense experience related to insurance risks, the rating of
 certain businesses or risks in this state without an ordinary
 insurance business purpose may adversely affect the economy, a
 sector of the economy, productivity, competition, jobs, the
 environment, or the public health and safety of this state or a
 portion of this state.
 Sec. 565.002.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "insurer" means
 an insurance company or other entity authorized to engage in the
 business of insurance in this state.  The term includes:
 (1)  a stock or mutual property and casualty insurance
 company;
 (2)  a Lloyd's plan;
 (3)  a reciprocal or interinsurance exchange;
 (4)  a county mutual insurance company;
 (5)  a farm mutual insurance company;
 (6)  any insurer writing a line of insurance regulated
 by Title 10;
 (7)  all life, health, and accident insurance companies
 regulated by the department, including:
 (A)  a stock or mutual life, health, or accident
 insurance company;
 (B)  a fraternal benefit society;
 (C)  a nonprofit hospital, medical, or dental
 service corporation, including a group hospital service
 corporation operating under Chapter 842; and
 (D)  a stipulated premium company; and
 (8)  a health maintenance organization operating under
 Chapter 843.
 Sec. 565.003.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. (a) Except as
 provided by this section, this chapter applies only to insurance
 policies issued and delivered by an insurer in this state.
 (b)  This chapter does not require the filing of rates for
 any line, type of insurer, or type of insurance business that is not
 specifically required by statute to file rates with the department.
 (c)  This chapter does not apply to:
 (1)  fidelity, guaranty, and surety bonds; or
 (2)  crop insurance.
 Sec. 565.004.  CONSTRUCTION OF CHAPTER. (a)  This chapter
 shall be construed and applied to promote the underlying purposes
 as provided by Section 565.001.
 (b)  This chapter may not be construed or applied to require:
 (1)  an insurer to write any line or type of business
 that the insurer does not write; or
 (2)  a material change in the insurer's current
 business plans.
 (c)  Nothing in this chapter is intended to create any type
 of private cause of action or independent basis in a civil or
 criminal proceeding.
 (d)  Nothing in this chapter is intended to prohibit the use
 of information that is relevant and related to the risk being
 insured even if that information may also be used or considered in
 developing an environmental, social, or governance model, score,
 factor, or standard.
 Sec. 565.005.  PROHIBITED CRITERIA. Except as provided by
 Section 565.006, an insurer may not use an environmental, social,
 or governance model, score, factor, or standard to charge a rate
 different than the rate charged to another business or risk in the
 same class for essentially the same hazard.
 Sec. 565.006.  EXCEPTION. An insurer does not violate
 Section 565.005 if the insurer's actions are based on an ordinary
 insurance business purpose, including the use of sound actuarial
 principles, or financial solvency considerations reasonably
 related to loss experience for the different types of risks and
 coverages made available by a particular insurer.
 Sec. 565.007.  REGULATORY ACTION. Nothing in this chapter
 is intended to authorize the department to adopt any rule, model, or
 standard requiring an insurer to use any environmental, social, or
 governance model law, regulation, or other standard that has not
 been specifically authorized by statute, including:
 (1)  a rule, model, or standard required under any
 federal law that does not preempt state law under the
 McCarran-Ferguson Act (15 U.S.C. Section 1012(b)); or
 (2)  a rule, model, or standard required by any
 national organization, including the National Association of
 Insurance Commissioners, that has not been specifically authorized
 by statute.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 565, Insurance Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to an insurance policy that is delivered, issued
 for delivery, or renewed in this state on or after January 1, 2024.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 833 passed the Senate on
 May 11, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 20, Nays 11.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 833 passed the House on
 May 24, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 86, Nays 54, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor