Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB842 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/08/2023

                    By: Hinojosa, Blanco S.B. No. 842
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2023; March 1, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; May 8, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 8, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to health benefit coverage for bariatric surgery under the
 state employees group benefits program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1551.225(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The board of trustees shall develop a cost-neutral or
 cost-positive plan for providing under the group benefits program
 bariatric surgery coverage for:
 (1)  employees eligible to participate in the program
 under Section 1551.101;
 (2)  annuitants eligible to participate in the program
 under Section 1551.102; and
 (3)  former state employees eligible to participate in
 the program under Section 1551.108.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a plan year that commences on or after January 1, 2024.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *