Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB888 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2023

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 888
 (In the Senate - Filed February 13, 2023; March 1, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 6, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 6, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 888 By:  Parker


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fire escape exemptions for certain courthouses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 791.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  This chapter does not apply to a county courthouse that:
 (1)  was constructed before September 1, 1989; and
 (2)  is located in a county with a population of less
 than 50,000.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *