Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB921 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/21/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 921
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2023; March 3, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 21, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 3; March 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the determination of a majority vote in certain
 elections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 2, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2.0215 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2.0215.  DETERMINATION OF MAJORITY VOTE. (a) In this
 section, "preferential voting system" means a voting system which
 permits a voter to rank each candidate through a numerical
 designation from the candidate the voter favors most to the
 candidate the voter favors least.
 (b)  In an election requiring a majority vote to be elected
 to a public office, a candidate must receive more than half of the
 votes as originally cast. A majority may not be determined by using
 a preferential voting system to reassign votes.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2.022(b), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Sections 2.0215, 2.023, 2.025, and 2.028 supersede a law
 outside this subchapter to the extent of any conflict.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *