Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB930 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/30/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Middleton S.B. No. 930
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2023; March 3, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 30, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; March 30, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 930 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the publication of opinions by a court.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 21, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 21.013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.013.  PUBLICATION OF OPINIONS. The authorship of an
 opinion published by a court is public information.  A court shall
 list the authors of any opinion published by the court.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an opinion published by a court on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A court opinion published before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the opinion was
 published, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *