Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB944 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/27/2023

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 944
 (In the Senate - Filed February 15, 2023; March 3, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 27, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 27, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 944 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the commitment order for individuals with intellectual
 disabilities who are committed to state supported living centers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 593.013, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 593.013.  [REQUIREMENT OF] INTERDISCIPLINARY TEAM
 RECOMMENDATION.
 SECTION 2.  Section 593.013(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 593.0511, a [A] person may
 not be admitted or committed to a residential care facility unless
 an interdisciplinary team recommends that placement.
 SECTION 3.  Section 593.041(d), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Except as provided by Section 593.0511, a [A] person may
 not be committed to the department for placement in a residential
 care facility under this subchapter unless a report by an
 interdisciplinary team recommending the placement has been
 completed during the six months preceding the date of the court
 hearing on the application.  If the report and recommendations have
 not been completed or revised during that period, the court shall
 order the report and recommendations on receiving the application.
 SECTION 4.  Section 593.050(d), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  The Texas Rules of Evidence apply.  The results of the
 determination of an intellectual disability and the current
 interdisciplinary team report and recommendations, except in the
 case of a long-term placement under Section 593.0511, shall be
 presented in evidence.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter C, Chapter 593, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 593.0511 to read as follows:
 Sec. 593.0511.  LONG-TERM PLACEMENT WITHOUT
 INTERDISCIPLINARY TEAM RECOMMENDATION.  A court may commit a
 proposed patient to long-term placement in a residential care
 facility without an interdisciplinary team recommendation under
 Section 593.013 if the court determines beyond a reasonable doubt
 that the placement is appropriate.
 SECTION 6.  Section 593.052(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A proposed resident may not be committed to a
 residential care facility unless:
 (1)  the proposed resident is a person with an
 intellectual disability;
 (2)  a petition to the court to issue a commitment order
 by the guardian of the proposed resident or, if the proposed
 resident is a minor, the parent of the proposed resident or the
 current interdisciplinary team report and recommendations, if
 applicable, show [evidence is presented showing] that because of
 the proposed resident's intellectual disability, the proposed
 resident:
 (A)  represents a substantial risk of physical
 impairment or injury to the proposed resident or others; or
 (B)  is unable to provide for and is not providing
 for the proposed resident's most basic personal physical needs;
 (3)  the proposed resident cannot be adequately and
 appropriately habilitated in an available, less restrictive
 setting; and
 (4)  the residential care facility provides
 habilitative services, care, training, and treatment appropriate
 to the proposed resident's needs.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *