Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB945 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/25/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 945
 (In the Senate - Filed February 15, 2023; March 3, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 25, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 25, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 945 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disclosure of certain health care cost information
 by certain health care facilities; authorizing an administrative
 penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 327.001(7), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (7)  "Facility" means a hospital, freestanding
 emergency medical care facility, urgent care or retail clinic,
 outpatient clinic, birthing center, ambulatory surgical center, or
 other facility that is licensed to provide health care services in
 this state [licensed under Chapter 241].
 SECTION 2.  Section 327.008(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission may impose an administrative penalty on a
 facility [in accordance with Chapter 241] if the facility fails to:
 (1)  respond to the commission's request to submit a
 corrective action plan; or
 (2)  comply with the requirements of a corrective
 action plan submitted to the commission.
 SECTION 3.  A health care facility required to disclose
 billing information under Chapter 327, Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by this Act, shall disclose the information in accordance
 with that chapter not later than August 31, 2027.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *