Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB959 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/22/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 959
 (In the Senate - Filed February 15, 2023; March 3, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 22, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 3; March 22, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain prohibited transactions between an
 open-enrollment charter school and an abortion provider or
 affiliate of the provider.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2273.001(4), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (4)  "Governmental entity" means this state, a state
 agency in the executive, judicial, or legislative branch of state
 government, [or] a political subdivision of this state, or an
 open-enrollment charter school established under Subchapter D,
 Chapter 12, Education Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2273.001(4), Government Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies only to a taxpayer resource transaction
 entered into on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *