Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB960 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/15/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    88R6356 KJE-F
 By: Campbell S.B. No. 960


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to state savings and government efficiency achieved
 through a taxpayer savings grant program administered by the
 comptroller of public accounts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 48.266, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the commissioner
 shall adjust enrollment estimates and entitlement for each school
 district for each school year based on information provided by the
 comptroller under Section 48.351(f). This subsection expires
 September 1, 2028.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 48, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter H to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H. TAXPAYER SAVINGS GRANTS
 Sec. 48.351.  TAXPAYER SAVINGS GRANT PROGRAM.  (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Eligible student" means a school-age child who
 resides in the state and who:
 (A)  is entering kindergarten or first grade;
 (B)  attended a public school for the entire
 school year immediately preceding initial participation in the
 Taxpayer Savings Grant Program; or
 (C)  participated in the program in a preceding
 school year.
 (2)  "Private school" means a school that:
 (A)  offers a course of instruction for elementary
 or secondary students;
 (B)  is not operated by a governmental entity; and
 (C)  is not a home school.
 (b)  A parent or legal guardian of an eligible student may
 receive reimbursement from the state for the tuition paid for the
 enrollment of the eligible student at a private school in an amount
 that is the lesser of:
 (1)  the tuition paid; or
 (2)  60 percent of the amount of state funding per
 student provided under Section 12.106.
 (c)  Money from the available school fund and federal funds
 may not be used for reimbursement under this section.
 (d)  A private school voluntarily selected by a parent for
 the parent's child to attend, with or without governmental
 assistance, may not be required to comply with any state law or rule
 governing the school's educational program that was not in effect
 on January 1, 2023.
 (e)  The comptroller shall administer the program and
 provide reimbursement to a parent or legal guardian of an eligible
 student as authorized by this section.
 (f)  Not later than October 1 of each year, the comptroller
 shall notify the commissioner and the Legislative Budget Board of
 the number of eligible students likely to participate in the
 program, disaggregated by the school district or open-enrollment
 charter school the eligible students would otherwise attend. Not
 later than March 1 of each year, the comptroller shall provide final
 information to the commissioner and the Legislative Budget Board
 regarding the number of students participating in the program,
 disaggregated in the same manner as the initial information.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable, but not later than
 October 15, 2023, the comptroller, in coordination with the
 commissioner of education, shall adopt rules to implement the
 Taxpayer Savings Grant Program under Section 48.351, Education
 Code, as added by this Act, including rules to prevent fraud in
 financial transactions under the program and to determine the net
 savings resulting from implementation of the program.  The rules
 must require reconciliation of payments for all grants within the
 same fiscal year or within the first month following the end of the
 fiscal year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.