Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB979 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/04/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 979
 (In the Senate - Filed February 16, 2023; March 3, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 May 4, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 12,
 Nays 0; May 4, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to safety training for certain public school
 extracurricular activities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.202(c), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The safety training program must include:
 (1)  certification of participants by the American Red
 Cross, the American Heart Association, or a similar organization or
 by the University Interscholastic League;
 (2)  current training in:
 (A)  emergency action planning;
 (B)  communicating effectively with 9-1-1
 emergency service operators and other emergency personnel; and
 (C)  recognizing symptoms of potentially
 catastrophic injuries, including head and neck injuries,
 concussions, injuries related to second impact syndrome, asthma
 attacks, heatstroke, rhabdomyolysis, cardiac arrest, and injuries
 requiring use of a defibrillator; and
 (3)  a safety drill that incorporates the training
 described by Subdivision (2) and simulates various injuries
 described by Subdivision (2)(C).
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2023-2024
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *