Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB999 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

                    By: West S.B. No. 999
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2023; March 3, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 17, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 17, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 999 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that providers of active shooter
 training at public schools and institutions of higher education
 obtain a certificate issued by the Texas Commission on Law
 Enforcement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.1141, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  A school district may not contract for the provision
 of active shooter training for the students or employees of a school
 unless the training provider is certified under Section 1701.2515,
 Occupations Code, to provide the training.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9363 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9363.  ACTIVE SHOOTER TRAINING PROVIDERS. An
 institution of higher education, as defined by Section 61.003, may
 not contract for the provision of active shooter training for the
 students or employees of the institution unless the training
 provider is certified under Section 1701.2515, Occupations Code, to
 provide the training.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.2515 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.2515.  CERTIFICATE REQUIRED TO PROVIDE ACTIVE
 SHOOTER TRAINING AT PUBLIC SCHOOLS AND INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER
 EDUCATION. (a)  In this section, "institution of higher education"
 has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  An individual or a legal entity may not provide active
 shooter training to students or employees at a public primary or
 secondary school or an institution of higher education unless:
 (1)  the individual providing the instruction is
 certified by the commission under this section to provide the
 training; and
 (2)  if the training is provided by a legal entity, both
 the legal entity and the individual providing the instruction on
 behalf of the legal entity are certified by the commission under
 this section to provide the training.
 (c)  The commission shall:
 (1)  establish a certification program for providers of
 active shooter training, including for individuals and legal
 entities; and
 (2)  issue a certificate to a provider who meets the
 qualifications of the program established under Subdivision (1).
 (d)  The commission shall adopt rules for the renewal of a
 certificate issued under this section. The commission may require
 continuing education for the renewal of the certificate.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than September 1, 2024, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall establish the certification
 program required by Section 1701.2515, Occupations Code, as added
 by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 37.1141(c-1) and 51.9363, Education
 Code, as added by this Act, and Section 1701.2515(b), Occupations
 Code, as added by this Act, apply only to active shooter training
 provided on or after December 1, 2024.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *