Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR5 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 01/11/2023

                    S.C.R. No. 5


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Section 17, Article III, Texas Constitution,
 provides that neither house of the legislature may adjourn for more
 than three days without the consent of the other house; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED by the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas, That
 each house grant the other permission to adjourn for more than three
 days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 12, 2023, and
 ending on Tuesday, January 17, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 5 was adopted by the Senate
 on January 10, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 5 was adopted by the House
 on January 11, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 149, Nays 0,
 one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Received:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Secretary of State