Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR7 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2023

                    By: Hinojosa S.C.R. No. 7
 (In the Senate - Filed January 12, 2023; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Administration;
 March 30, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, State law stipulates in Section 2165.256,
 Government Code, that a person specified in a concurrent resolution
 adopted by the legislature is eligible for burial in the State
 Cemetery if the State Cemetery Committee finds that the person has
 made a significant contribution to Texas history and, based on that
 finding, approves the person's burial; and
 WHEREAS, Patrick John Nugent, a former executive director of
 the Texas Pipeline Association, is a pioneering figure who played a
 vital role in improving state infrastructure and whose professional
 achievements helped ensure the safety and well-being of countless
 Texans, and his request for burial in the State Cemetery merits
 approval by the committee; and
 WHEREAS, Born on July 9, 1943, Patrick Nugent graduated from
 Campion Jesuit High School in 1961 and Marquette University in
 1965; he went on to join the Texas Air National Guard, and he served
 with the 315th Special Operations Wing in South Vietnam; his honors
 include the Distinguished Flying Cross and the Air Medal with two
 oak leaf clusters; and
 WHEREAS, Following his service with the Texas military,
 Mr. Nugent became executive vice president of the LBJ Company, and
 he was active on the boards of Texas Commerce Bank and Bank of the
 Hills, as well as the Travis County Child Welfare board; he later
 embarked on a rewarding career as an assistant director of the
 Railroad Commission of Texas; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Nugent was elected executive director of TPA in
 1983, and over the course of his tenure, he oversaw numerous
 advocacy efforts related to pipeline safety, environmental
 regulations, taxation, and legislation; he further distinguished
 himself through his 35 years of service as an ex officio member of
 the Texas Natural Gas Reliability Council, which provides natural
 gas supplies to regions affected by extreme heat or cold; and
 WHEREAS, In his retirement, Mr. Nugent continues to benefit
 his community as an active member and trustee of Veterans of Foreign
 Wars Post No. 856; and
 WHEREAS, In light of his noteworthy contributions to the Lone
 Star State, it is fitting that Patrick John Nugent be allowed to
 designate the State Cemetery as his final resting place; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby authorize the burial of Patrick John Nugent in the State
 Cemetery, provided that his application for assignment of burial
 space is approved by the State Cemetery Committee as required by
 law.
 * * * * *