Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR56 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

                    By: Schwertner S.J.R. No. 56
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2023; March 3, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 17, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 17, Nays 0; April 17, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 56 By:  Schwertner


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to raise the maximum allowable
 amount of money in the economic stabilization fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 49-g(g), Article III, Texas
 Constitution, is amended to read as follows:
 (g)  During each fiscal biennium, the amount in the economic
 stabilization fund may not exceed an amount equal to 15 [10] percent
 of the total amount, excluding investment income, interest income,
 and amounts borrowed from special funds, deposited in general
 revenue during the preceding biennium.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment to raise the maximum
 allowable amount of money in the economic stabilization fund."
 * * * * *