Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR56 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/16/2023

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 16, 2023       TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: SJR56 by Schwertner (proposing a constitutional amendment to raise the maximum allowable amount of money in the economic stabilization fund.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SJR56, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted : a negative impact of ($436,467,406) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. In addition, the joint resolution would result in a negative impact to General Revenue Related Funds of ($8,417,984,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2024($204,406)2025($436,263,000)2026($4,157,583,000)2027($4,260,401,000)2028($3,096,379,000)All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 Probable Revenue Gain fromEconomic Stabilization Fund599 Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund12024$0$0($204,406)2025($436,263,000)$0$02026($4,157,583,000)$629,157,000$02027($4,260,401,000)$4,288,132,000$02028($3,096,379,000)$4,550,853,000$0 Fiscal AnalysisThe joint resolution would amend Sections 49-g (g) of Article III, Texas Constitution to raise the maximum amount (cap) in the economic stabilization fund (ESF) from an amount equal to 10 percent of the total amount deposited in general revenue during the preceding biennium --excluding investment income, interest income, and amounts borrowed from special funds-- to 15 percent of that amount. The proposed amendment would be submitted to voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 16, 2023

 

 

  TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: SJR56 by Schwertner (proposing a constitutional amendment to raise the maximum allowable amount of money in the economic stabilization fund.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted   

TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SJR56 by Schwertner (proposing a constitutional amendment to raise the maximum allowable amount of money in the economic stabilization fund.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance

 Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 SJR56 by Schwertner (proposing a constitutional amendment to raise the maximum allowable amount of money in the economic stabilization fund.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted 

 SJR56 by Schwertner (proposing a constitutional amendment to raise the maximum allowable amount of money in the economic stabilization fund.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SJR56, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted : a negative impact of ($436,467,406) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. In addition, the joint resolution would result in a negative impact to General Revenue Related Funds of ($8,417,984,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SJR56, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted : a negative impact of ($436,467,406) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. In addition, the joint resolution would result in a negative impact to General Revenue Related Funds of ($8,417,984,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027.

In addition, the joint resolution would result in a negative impact to General Revenue Related Funds of ($8,417,984,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2027.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2024 ($204,406)
2025 ($436,263,000)
2026 ($4,157,583,000)
2027 ($4,260,401,000)
2028 ($3,096,379,000)

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2024 $0 $0 ($204,406)
2025 ($436,263,000) $0 $0
2026 ($4,157,583,000) $629,157,000 $0
2027 ($4,260,401,000) $4,288,132,000 $0
2028 ($3,096,379,000) $4,550,853,000 $0

 Fiscal Analysis

The joint resolution would amend Sections 49-g (g) of Article III, Texas Constitution to raise the maximum amount (cap) in the economic stabilization fund (ESF) from an amount equal to 10 percent of the total amount deposited in general revenue during the preceding biennium --excluding investment income, interest income, and amounts borrowed from special funds-- to 15 percent of that amount. The proposed amendment would be submitted to voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023.

 Methodology

The increase in the ESF cap as proposed would result in increased transfers of oil and gas severance taxes and equivalent decreases in available general revenue. In addition, interest would be credited to the ESF cash balance that, pursuant to the current law cap, would be allocable to the general revenue fund. Investment income, as distinct from interest, would continue to be credited to the fund and not be allocable to general revenue when the fund balance exceeds the cap.The cost to the state for publication of the resolution is $204,406.

The cost to the state for publication of the resolution is $204,406.

 Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, KK, SD

JMc, KK, SD