Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR75 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.J.R. No. 75


 proposing a constitutional amendment creating the Texas water fund
 to assist in financing water projects in this state.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 49-d-16 to read as follows:
 Sec. 49-d-16.  (a)  The Texas water fund is created as a
 special fund in the state treasury outside the general revenue
 fund.  The fund is administered by the Texas Water Development Board
 or by that board's successor in function as provided by general law.
 The legislature may appropriate money for the purpose of depositing
 the money to the fund to be available for transfer as provided by
 Subsection (b) of this section.
 (b)  The administrator of the Texas water fund may use the
 fund only to transfer money to other funds or accounts administered
 by the Texas Water Development Board or that board's successor in
 function. Money transferred from the Texas water fund to a fund or
 account may be spent without further legislative appropriation in
 the manner provided by general law governing the use of money in the
 fund or account to which the money was transferred.  The
 administrator may restore to the fund money transferred from the
 fund and deposited to the credit of another fund or account.
 Legislative appropriation is not required for the administrator to
 transfer money from or restore money to the fund, including the
 transfer of money from the fund to or the restoration of the money
 from:
 (1)  the Water Assistance Fund No. 480;
 (2)  the New Water Supply for Texas Fund;
 (3)  the Rural Water Assistance Fund No. 301; or
 (4)  the Statewide Water Public Awareness Account.
 (c)  The Texas water fund consists of:
 (1)  money transferred or deposited to the credit of
 the fund by general law, including money appropriated by the
 legislature directly to the fund and money from any source
 transferred or deposited to the credit of the fund authorized by
 general law;
 (2)  any other revenue that the legislature by statute
 dedicates for deposit to the credit of the fund;
 (3)  investment earnings and interest earned on amounts
 credited to the fund;
 (4)  money from gifts, grants, or donations to the
 fund; and
 (5)  money returned from any authorized transfer.
 (d)  The legislature by general law shall provide for the
 manner in which money from the Texas water fund may be used, subject
 to the limitations provided by this section.
 (e)  Of the amount of money initially appropriated to the
 Texas water fund, the administrator of the fund shall allocate not
 less than 25 percent to be used only for transfer to the New Water
 Supply for Texas Fund.
 (f)  The expenses of managing the investments of the Texas
 water fund shall be paid from that fund.
 (g)  For purposes of Section 22, Article VIII, of this
 constitution:
 (1)  money in the Texas water fund is dedicated by this
 constitution; and
 (2)  an appropriation of state tax revenues for the
 purpose of depositing money to the credit of the Texas water fund is
 treated as if it were an appropriation of revenues dedicated by this
 constitution.
 (h)  Any unexpended and unobligated balance remaining in the
 Texas water fund at the end of a state fiscal biennium is
 appropriated to the administrator of that fund for the following
 state fiscal biennium for the purposes authorized by this section.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment creating the Texas
 water fund to assist in financing water projects in this state."
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 75 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2023, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2023, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2023, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 75 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 16, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 135,
 Nays 4, one present not voting; May 23, 2023, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2023, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Received:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Secretary of State