Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR313 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/15/2023

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 313
 WHEREAS, The 100th birthday of an esteemed Texan is indeed
 cause for celebration, and Cynthia Horn of Carthage marked this
 momentous milestone in her life on March 1, 2023, to the delight
 of her family and friends; and
 WHEREAS, Born in 1923, the former Cynthia Carter studied
 fashion and design in New York City until the outbreak of World
 War II, when her family urged her to return to Texas; she married
 Arthur J. Leedy on July 6, 1945, and they were blessed with five
 children, Marion, Hal, Patrick, Cully, and Ruthie; through the
 years, her treasured family grew to include 13 grandchildren and
 23 great-grandchildren; the couple shared a fulfilling
 relationship of 51 years until Mr. Leedy's passing; fortunate
 enough to find love a second time, she wed Luther Cleo Horn on
 August 17, 2002; Mr. Horn passed away in 2005; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Horn is a talented artist, and she has
 enjoyed drawing cartoons, cookbook illustrations, and
 caricatures of her friends; for many years, she sang in the choir
 at First Presbyterian Church in Orange; later, she attended the
 Episcopal Church in Carthage; she volunteered extensively for
 church functions and at Mission Carthage; through her kindness,
 optimism, and sincerity, she has earned the admiration of
 innumerable people, and her wonderful sense of humor brightens
 the days of all around her; and
 WHEREAS, Cynthia Horn is a source of tremendous
 inspiration, and in sharing the experience gained through a
 century of life well lived, she bestows a precious gift of
 wisdom that benefits all who are privileged to know her; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby congratulate Cynthia Horn on her 100th
 birthday and extend sincere best wishes for continued happiness;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for Mrs. Horn as an expression of high regard from the
 Texas Senate.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 15, 2023.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate