Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR518 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/04/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 518
 In Memory
 of
 Brad Wolf
 WHEREAS, The family and friends of Bradley Theodore Wolf of
 Windthorst suffered an immeasurable loss with his death on
 March 3, 2023, at the age of 39; and
 WHEREAS, Brad Wolf was born to Peter Daniel Wolf and
 Kenda Claudette Wolf on July 13, 1983, in Wichita Falls and
 grew up with the companionship of two siblings, Gretchen and
 Keith; a 2001 graduate of Windthorst High School, he joined the
 U.S. Marine Corps and honorably served his country for six
 years; he went on to work as a senior aircraft mechanic at
 Sheppard Air Force Base; and
 WHEREAS, On August 1, 2009, Mr. Wolf married the former
 Dena Renae McCord, and the couple settled in Windthorst, where
 they raised their daughter, Riley; a devoted father, he
 delighted in coaching his daughter's softball team and taking
 her hunting; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Wolf played an active role in his community,
 serving as a Windthorst Independent School District trustee, as a
 captain with the Windthorst Volunteer Fire Department, and as an
 EMT; sustained by an abiding faith, he was a valued member of
 St. Boniface Catholic Church, and he was a Grand Knight in the
 Knights of Columbus; and
 WHEREAS, Brad Wolf brightened the world around him with his
 kindness, his generosity of spirit, and his infectious smile, and
 he leaves behind a record of service that his loved ones can
 remember with pride; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Bradley Theodore
 Wolf and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family:
 to his wife, Dena Wolf; to his daughter, Riley Jaye Wolf; to his
 father, Pete Wolf, and his wife, Wendy; to his mother, Claudette
 Saorski, and her husband, Hartmut; to his grandmother, Gladys
 Wolf; to his sister, Gretchen Wolf; to his brother, Keith Wolf,
 and his wife, Katie; to his nephew, Greyson Wolf; to his
 father-in-law and mother-in-law, Rusty and Lisa McCord; and to
 his other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Brad Wolf.
 Springer
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 4, 2023, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate