Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR647 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/23/2023

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 647
 In Memory
 of
 Jeanne Samuels
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Jeanne Beulah Franklin Samuels, longtime editor of the
 Jewish Herald Voice, on May 12, 2023, at the age of 99; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Louis and Edith Franklin, the
 former Jeanne Franklin was born in Casper, Wyoming, on December
 26, 1923; her family moved to Wichita Falls and then settled in
 Houston, where she grew up with three siblings, Jack, Bob, and
 Gay; after graduating from Lamar High School, she attended The
 University of Texas for a year until her beloved mother fell ill;
 she met her future husband, Joe Samuels, while waiting at a bus
 stop, and they wed on August 4, 1943; as a cadet in the U.S. Army
 Air Corps, he was supposed to be single, so she followed him
 secretly to every duty station until he shipped out to the
 European Theater; during World War II, she was employed by the
 Houston Area Rent Control Office of the Office of Price
 Administration; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Samuels were blessed with a son,
 Marc, and two daughters, Maurene and Vicki; while raising their
 children, they owned a record and electronics store and an
 insurance agency; they found their calling on April 1, 1973, when
 they purchased the Jewish Herald-Voice, then a 65-year-old
 publication; dedicated to serving the region's Jewish community,
 they spent long hours reporting on events, opining on issues, and
 demonstrating support for the State of Israel; in order to cover
 the concerns of their readers, they added pages even when it was
 not helpful to the bottom line; when they wrote about their
 international travel, their accounts often moved readers to
 donate to Jewish causes in Israel and around the world; their
 contributions were recognized by numerous local and national
 organizations, both secular and faith-based; following the death
 of Mr. Samuels in 2011, Mrs. Samuels continued to serve as editor
 and publisher until she was 98; and
 WHEREAS, The Samuels home was always open to family and
 friends who needed a place to stay; the couple loved having
 slumber parties for their grandchildren, Matt, Benjamin,
 Caroline, Wendy, Daniel, Kimberly, Amy "Adina," Michael, David,
 Sam, and Rebekah; Mrs. Samuels got them ready for bed by reading
 from A Child's Garden of Verses and other favorites; she baked
 beautiful birthday cakes, tended a large vegetable garden, and
 adored the family's boxers and other pets; kind and
 compassionate, she began delivering Meals on Wheels at the age of
 89; and
 WHEREAS, Although Jeanne Samuels is deeply missed, her
 devotion to her family, her faith, and her community will remain
 a source of tremendous inspiration to all who were privileged to
 know her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Jeanne Beulah
 Franklin Samuels and extend sincere sympathy to all who mourn her
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Jeanne Beulah Franklin Samuels.
 Miles, Alvarado, Bettencourt
 West, Whitmire
 ______________________________
 Member, Texas Senate
 ____________________________________________________________
 Member, Texas Senate               Member, Texas Senate
 ____________________________________________________________
 Member, Texas Senate               Member, Texas Senate
  ______________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 23, 2023, by a
  rising vote.
  ______________________________
  Secretary of the Senate