Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR647 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/24/2023

                    88R31644 BPG-D
 By: Miles, et al. S.R. No. 647


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Jeanne Beulah Franklin Samuels, longtime editor of the
 Jewish Herald Voice, on May 12, 2023, at the age of 99; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Louis and Edith Franklin, the former
 Jeanne Franklin was born in Casper, Wyoming, on December 26, 1923;
 her family moved to Wichita Falls and then settled in Houston, where
 she grew up with three siblings, Jack, Bob, and Gay; after
 graduating from Lamar High School, she attended The University of
 Texas for a year until her beloved mother fell ill; she met her
 future husband, Joe Samuels, while waiting at a bus stop, and they
 wed on August 4, 1943; as a cadet in the U.S. Army Air Corps, he was
 supposed to be single, so she followed him secretly to every duty
 station until he shipped out to the European Theater; during World
 War II, she was employed by the Houston Area Rent Control Office of
 the Office of Price Administration; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Samuels were blessed with a son, Marc,
 and two daughters, Maurene and Vicki; while raising their children,
 they owned a record and electronics store and an insurance agency;
 they found their calling on April 1, 1973, when they purchased the
 Jewish Herald-Voice, then a 65-year-old publication; dedicated to
 serving the region's Jewish community, they spent long hours
 reporting on events, opining on issues, and demonstrating support
 for the State of Israel; in order to cover the concerns of their
 readers, they added pages even when it was not helpful to the bottom
 line; when they wrote about their international travel, their
 accounts often moved readers to donate to Jewish causes in Israel
 and around the world; their contributions were recognized by
 numerous local and national organizations, both secular and
 faith-based; following the death of Mr. Samuels in 2011,
 Mrs. Samuels continued to serve as editor and publisher until she
 was 98; and
 WHEREAS, The Samuels home was always open to family and
 friends who needed a place to stay; the couple loved having slumber
 parties for their grandchildren, Matt, Benjamin, Caroline, Wendy,
 Daniel, Kimberly, Amy "Adina," Michael, David, Sam, and Rebekah;
 Mrs. Samuels got them ready for bed by reading from A Child's Garden
 of Verses and other favorites; she baked beautiful birthday cakes,
 tended a large vegetable garden, and adored the family's boxers and
 other pets; kind and compassionate, she began delivering Meals on
 Wheels at the age of 89; and
 WHEREAS, Although Jeanne Samuels is deeply missed, her
 devotion to her family, her faith, and her community will remain a
 source of tremendous inspiration to all who were privileged to know
 her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the 88th Texas Legislature
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Jeanne Beulah Franklin Samuels and
 extend sincere sympathy to all who mourn her passing; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this
 day, it do so in memory of Jeanne Beulah Franklin Samuels.