SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 647 In Memory of Jeanne Samuels WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the passing of Jeanne Beulah Franklin Samuels, longtime editor of the Jewish Herald Voice, on May 12, 2023, at the age of 99; and WHEREAS, The daughter of Louis and Edith Franklin, the former Jeanne Franklin was born in Casper, Wyoming, on December 26, 1923; her family moved to Wichita Falls and then settled in Houston, where she grew up with three siblings, Jack, Bob, and Gay; after graduating from Lamar High School, she attended The University of Texas for a year until her beloved mother fell ill; she met her future husband, Joe Samuels, while waiting at a bus stop, and they wed on August 4, 1943; as a cadet in the U.S. Army Air Corps, he was supposed to be single, so she followed him secretly to every duty station until he shipped out to the European Theater; during World War II, she was employed by the Houston Area Rent Control Office of the Office of Price Administration; and WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Samuels were blessed with a son, Marc, and two daughters, Maurene and Vicki; while raising their children, they owned a record and electronics store and an insurance agency; they found their calling on April 1, 1973, when they purchased the Jewish Herald-Voice, then a 65-year-old publication; dedicated to serving the region's Jewish community, they spent long hours reporting on events, opining on issues, and demonstrating support for the State of Israel; in order to cover the concerns of their readers, they added pages even when it was not helpful to the bottom line; when they wrote about their international travel, their accounts often moved readers to donate to Jewish causes in Israel and around the world; their contributions were recognized by numerous local and national organizations, both secular and faith-based; following the death of Mr. Samuels in 2011, Mrs. Samuels continued to serve as editor and publisher until she was 98; and WHEREAS, The Samuels home was always open to family and friends who needed a place to stay; the couple loved having slumber parties for their grandchildren, Matt, Benjamin, Caroline, Wendy, Daniel, Kimberly, Amy "Adina," Michael, David, Sam, and Rebekah; Mrs. Samuels got them ready for bed by reading from A Child's Garden of Verses and other favorites; she baked beautiful birthday cakes, tended a large vegetable garden, and adored the family's boxers and other pets; kind and compassionate, she began delivering Meals on Wheels at the age of 89; and WHEREAS, Although Jeanne Samuels is deeply missed, her devotion to her family, her faith, and her community will remain a source of tremendous inspiration to all who were privileged to know her; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Jeanne Beulah Franklin Samuels and extend sincere sympathy to all who mourn her passing; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Jeanne Beulah Franklin Samuels. Miles, Alvarado, Bettencourt West, Whitmire ______________________________ Member, Texas Senate ____________________________________________________________ Member, Texas Senate Member, Texas Senate ____________________________________________________________ Member, Texas Senate Member, Texas Senate ______________________________ President of the Senate I hereby certify that the above Resolution was adopted by the Senate on May 23, 2023, by a rising vote. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate