LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Committees
Resolutions Calendars
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Resolutions Calendars Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
House Resolutions Calendars Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR1476
Congratulating Riazul Mia on his retirement as assistant city manager of Laredo.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR459
Recognizing March 29, 2023, as Texas Black Nurses Day.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR348
Recognizing March 30, 2023, as Texas Association of African American Chambers of Commerce Black Business Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR347
Recognizing March 15, 2023, as Minority Business Enterprise Public Policy Day.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR575
Recognizing April 4, 2023, as 100 Black Men of America, Inc., Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR576
Recognizing April 4, 2023, as Texas NAACP Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR871
Recognizing April 2, 2023, as World Autism Awareness Day.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR674
Recognizing March 29, 2023, as 4-H Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR2098
Recognizing May 21 through 27, 2023, as National PEO Week.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR1418
Congratulating the Texas Poultry Federation and Affiliates on its 100th anniversary.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR585
Recognizing the Texas Forestry Association on the occasion of its seedling giveaway.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR1004
Congratulating Sonny Dykes, head coach of the Texas Christian University football team, on a successful 2022 season.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR2096
Commemorating the 60th anniversary of the Camille Lightner Playhouse in Brownsville.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR2095
Recognizing the eBridge Center for Business and Commercialization for its contributions to Brownsville and the Rio Grande Valley.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR1688
Commending Dr. Sylvia Trent-Adams on her appointment as president of the University of North Texas Health Science Center at Fort Worth.
Page 313 of 667
313
314
315
316
317
318
319
320
321
322