LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Committees
Resolutions Calendars
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Resolutions Calendars Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
House Resolutions Calendars Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR561
Introduced
2/22/11
Introduced
2/22/11
Refer
2/24/11
Refer
2/24/11
Enrolled
3/15/11
Enrolled
3/15/11
Passed
3/15/11
Passed
3/15/11
Recognizing March 9, 2011, as Mid-Valley Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR560
Introduced
2/22/11
Introduced
2/22/11
Refer
2/24/11
Refer
2/24/11
Enrolled
3/15/11
Enrolled
3/15/11
Passed
3/15/11
Passed
3/15/11
Recognizing Dr. Audrey Jones for her contributions to the medical profession and her service to the Texas Legislature as Physician of the Day for February 23, 2011.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR556
Introduced
2/22/11
Introduced
2/22/11
Refer
2/24/11
Refer
2/24/11
Enrolled
3/17/11
Enrolled
3/17/11
Passed
3/17/11
Passed
3/17/11
Recognizing March 8, 2011, as Brazoria County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HCR175
Introduced
2/23/11
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/24/11
Refer
2/24/11
Enrolled
3/2/11
Enrolled
3/2/11
Passed
3/2/11
Passed
3/2/11
Commemorating the 175th anniversary of the adoption of the Texas Declaration of Independence.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR568
Introduced
2/23/11
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/24/11
Refer
2/24/11
Enrolled
3/15/11
Enrolled
3/15/11
Passed
3/15/11
Passed
3/15/11
In memory of Gregory Scott Coleman of Austin.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR566
Introduced
2/23/11
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/24/11
Refer
2/24/11
Enrolled
3/2/11
Enrolled
3/2/11
Passed
3/2/11
Passed
3/2/11
Congratulating the Idalou High School football team on winning the 2010 UIL 2A Division 2 state championship.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR575
Introduced
2/23/11
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/28/11
Refer
2/28/11
Enrolled
3/9/11
Enrolled
3/9/11
Passed
3/9/11
Passed
3/9/11
In memory of San Antonio Police Officer John Anthony "Rocky" Riojas.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR570
Introduced
2/23/11
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/28/11
Refer
2/28/11
Enrolled
3/23/11
Enrolled
3/23/11
Passed
3/23/11
Passed
3/23/11
Commemorating the 70th anniversary of the Texas State Guard.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR574
Introduced
2/23/11
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/28/11
Enrolled
3/17/11
Passed
3/17/11
Congratulating Emily Barton on earning the 2010 Volunteer Lifetime Achievement Award from the American Cancer Society's High Plains Division.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HCR70
Introduced
2/23/11
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/24/11
Refer
2/24/11
Enrolled
3/2/11
Enrolled
3/2/11
Passed
3/18/11
Passed
3/18/11
Recognizing February 28, 2011, as Texas Southern University Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR572
Introduced
2/23/11
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/28/11
Refer
2/28/11
Enrolled
3/17/11
Enrolled
3/17/11
Passed
3/17/11
Passed
3/17/11
Congratulating Mount Vernon Rotary Club members who have been named Paul Harris Fellows.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR583
Introduced
2/23/11
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/28/11
Refer
2/28/11
Enrolled
3/16/11
Enrolled
3/16/11
Passed
3/16/11
Passed
3/16/11
Honoring the Pasadena Volunteer Fire Department.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR573
Introduced
2/23/11
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/28/11
Refer
2/28/11
Enrolled
3/17/11
Enrolled
3/17/11
Passed
3/17/11
Passed
3/17/11
Honoring Youth Leadership New Braunfels for its promotion of civic leadership and volunteerism.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR584
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/28/11
Enrolled
4/5/11
Passed
4/5/11
Passed
4/5/11
Recognizing April 27, 2011, as Texas Water Conservation Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular
Texas House Bill HR581
Introduced
2/23/11
Introduced
2/23/11
Refer
2/28/11
Refer
2/28/11
Enrolled
4/5/11
Enrolled
4/5/11
Passed
4/5/11
Passed
4/5/11
Recognizing April 6, 2011, as Atascosa County Day at the State Capitol.
Page 331 of 667
331
332
333
334
335
336
337
338
339
340