LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Committees
Resolutions Calendars
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Resolutions Calendars Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
House Resolutions Calendars Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR114
In memory of Officer David Charles Sherrard of the Richardson Police Department.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR116
Recognizing February 20, 2019, as Lufkin and Angelina County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR117
Recognizing May 2, 2019, as National Day of Prayer in Texas.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR120
Honoring Dr. Stephen L. Mansfield for his service as president and CEO of Methodist Health System.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SCR11
Recognizing the Shoults family on the 75th anniversary of Bear Creek Smokehouse.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR125
Congratulating Khalid Donnel Robinson of El Paso on his successful career in the music industry.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR127
Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Howard County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR130
Honoring Leadership Mission on the occasion of the group's visit to the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR133
In memory of Richard A. Overton of Austin.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR134
Recognizing February 25, 2019, as Greater Houston Black Chamber Legislative Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR138
Honoring the visiting delegation from The Colony on the occasion of their visit to the State Capitol on January 29, 2019.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR144
Welcoming members of Leadership Gainesville to the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR143
Honoring Dr. Charles Richard Queen for his achievements as a veteran, physician, and civic leader in Edinburg.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR141
Recognizing March 4, 2019, as 9-1-1 Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR137
Recognizing September 2019 as Pulmonary Fibrosis Awareness Month.
Page 384 of 667
384
385
386
387
388
389
390
391
392
393