Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

House Resolutions Calendars Committee Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR69

Commending members of the Texas Dental Association and Texas Dental Association Smiles Foundation and recognizing the 2018 Texas Mission of Mercy.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR76

Paying tribute to the life of Irma Rangel and honoring the students of the Irma Lerma Rangel Young Women's Leadership School in 2016-2017, on the 13th anniversary of the opening of the school.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR86

Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on April 16, 2017, the 46th anniversary of her birth.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR89

Commemorating the 2018 Oak Cliff Coalition for the Arts Cinco de Mayo parade and street festival.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR71

Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2017, the 29th anniversary of his death.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR67

Recognizing the 31st annual Grand Prairie Cinco de Mayo celebration in 2018.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR70

Commending members of the Texas Dental Association and Texas Dental Association Smiles Foundation and recognizing the 2017 Texas Mission of Mercy.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR81

Commemorating the 114th anniversary of Oak Cliff's annexation to Dallas in 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR95

Congratulating Lieutenant Dennis Stanek on his retirement from the West University Place Fire Department.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR87

Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on April 16, 2018, the 47th anniversary of her birth.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR84

Honoring the life of Benito Juarez on March 21, 2017, the 211th anniversary of his birth.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR75

Commemorating the 1969 Crystal City student walkout in 2018, the 49th anniversary of the event.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR62

Commemorating the 12th anniversary of the Dallas Mega March for American Values and Justice on April 9, 2018.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR93

Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on March 31, 2018, the 23rd anniversary of her passing.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR63

Commemorating the 11th anniversary of the Dallas Mega March for American Values and Justice on April 9, 2017.