LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Committees
Resolutions Calendars
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Resolutions Calendars Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
House Resolutions Calendars Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR1897
Congratulating Taylor Nunez of Randolph High School in Universal City on winning four gold medals at the 2023 UIL Track & Field State Meet.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR248
In memory of Cruz Reyes Hinojosa Sr. of Houston.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR62
Commemorating the 12th anniversary of the Dallas Mega March for American Values and Justice on April 9, 2018.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR93
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on March 31, 2018, the 23rd anniversary of her passing.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR63
Commemorating the 11th anniversary of the Dallas Mega March for American Values and Justice on April 9, 2017.
TX
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas House Bill HR207
In memory of James Nolen Swafford of Grand Prairie.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR94
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on March 31, 2017, the 22nd anniversary of her passing.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR66
Recognizing Diez y Seis de Septiembre 2018.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR73
Honoring the 2018 and former presidents of the Mexican American Democrats of Texas.
TX
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas House Bill HR208
In memory of Judy Swafford of Grand Prairie.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR87
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on April 16, 2018, the 47th anniversary of her birth.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR84
Honoring the life of Benito Juarez on March 21, 2017, the 211th anniversary of his birth.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR75
Commemorating the 1969 Crystal City student walkout in 2018, the 49th anniversary of the event.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR68
Recognizing Diez y Seis de Septiembre 2017.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR1492
Congratulating radio station KPAN in Hereford on its 75th anniversary.
Page 50 of 667
50
51
52
53
54
55
56
57
58
59