LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Committees
Resolutions Calendars
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Resolutions Calendars Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
House Resolutions Calendars Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR63
Commemorating the 11th anniversary of the Dallas Mega March for American Values and Justice on April 9, 2017.
TX
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas House Bill HR207
In memory of James Nolen Swafford of Grand Prairie.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR94
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on March 31, 2017, the 22nd anniversary of her passing.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR66
Recognizing Diez y Seis de Septiembre 2018.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR73
Honoring the 2018 and former presidents of the Mexican American Democrats of Texas.
TX
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas House Bill HR208
In memory of Judy Swafford of Grand Prairie.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR87
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Prez on April 16, 2018, the 47th anniversary of her birth.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR84
Honoring the life of Benito Juarez on March 21, 2017, the 211th anniversary of his birth.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR75
Commemorating the 1969 Crystal City student walkout in 2018, the 49th anniversary of the event.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR68
Recognizing Diez y Seis de Septiembre 2017.
TX
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HR1492
Congratulating radio station KPAN in Hereford on its 75th anniversary.
TX
Texas 2019 - 86th Regular
Texas House Bill HR134
Recognizing February 25, 2019, as Greater Houston Black Chamber Legislative Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR92
Recognizing February 2-8, 2017, as Chicano History Week.
TX
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas House Bill HR204
Honoring Texas game wardens for 125 years of service to the Lone Star State.
TX
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HR82
Honoring the life of Cesar Chavez and commemorating the 90th anniversary of his birth on March 31, 2017.
Page 51 of 667
51
52
53
54
55
56
57
58
59
60