Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR303

Recognizing February 27, 2023, as Washington County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR304

Honoring The Woman's Hospital of Texas on HCA Advocacy Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR305

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Sheriffs' Association of Texas Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR306

Recognizing March 29, 2023, as Mission Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR307

Congratulating Clifford R. Shaw on his retirement from the Cedar Hill City Council.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR308

In memory of Donald J. Maison of Dallas.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR309

Recognizing the Autism Society of America and the Autism Society of Texas for their advocacy work and recognizing April 4, 2023, as Texas Autism Advocacy Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR31

Congratulating Houston Astros shortstop Jeremy Pea on being named the 2022 Most Valuable Player of the American League Championship Series and the World Series.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR310

Recognizing the Texas Food & Fuel Association.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR311

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Supermarket Employee Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR312

Recognizing the Autism Society of America and the Autism Society of Texas for their advocacy work and recognizing April 4, 2023, as Texas Autism Advocacy Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR313

Recognizing March 7, 2023, as Texas Muslim Capitol Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR314

Recognizing March 1, 2023, as Uvalde County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR315

In memory of Kristen Michelle Bryant.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR316

Recognizing February 28, 2023, as Nurse Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records