Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR317

Commemorating Bone Marrow, Blood, and Organ Donation Registry Day 2023.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR318

Recognizing March 7, 2023, as University of Houston-Clear Lake Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR319

Recognizing December 8, 2023, as Special Hearts Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR32

Recognizing January 25, 2023, as Andrews County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR320

Recognizing February 28, 2023, as Communities In Schools Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR321

In memory of Garrett Blake Ingram of College Station.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR322

In memory of Clarence Ray Pennington of Salado.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR323

Granting permission for the floor of the House to be opened on April 30, 2023, for Boy Scouts of America Troop 5.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR324

Congratulating Collin County commissioner Duncan Webb on his receipt of a 2023 TxDOT Road Hand Award.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR325

Honoring June Jenkins for her service as president of the Collin County Branch of the NAACP.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR326

Congratulating David Downs on being named the 2022 Citizen of the Year by the Plano Chamber of Commerce.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR327

Recognizing Chad Robichaux for his work with Save Our Allies.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR328

In memory of former Texas state representative Joe Barnett Cannon.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR329

In memory of attorney and criminal justice advocate Jeff Blackburn.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR33

Congratulating Muleshoe High School on its selection as a 2022 National Blue Ribbon School.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records