Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR344

Honoring former State Representative Joseph D. Deshotel for his service.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR345

Recognizing February 28, 2023, as Athens Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR346

Commemorating the centennial of Midwestern State University.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR347

Recognizing March 15, 2023, as Minority Business Enterprise Public Policy Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR348

Recognizing March 30, 2023, as Texas Association of African American Chambers of Commerce Black Business Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR349

Honoring The Arc of Greater Beaumont for its service to individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR35

In memory of legendary college football coach Mike Leach.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR350

Recognizing March 1, 2023, as Floresville Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR351

Recognizing March 7, 2023, as Starr County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR352

Recognizing February 28, 2023, as Wharton County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR353

In memory of Charles William Thurman.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR354

Commemorating the 100th anniversary of Texas Tech University.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR355

Recognizing March 1, 2023, as Irving-Las Colinas Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR356

Commemorating the 125th anniversary of Lewisville High School.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR357

Recognizing February 28, 2023, as Texas Anesthesiologists Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records