Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR439

Recognizing March 9, 2023, as East Texas Community Supervision Alliance Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR44

Recognizing February 23, 2023, as Fort Bend County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR440

In memory of Draco Miller of Brownwood.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR441

Recognizing Texas Energy Day at the State Capitol on March 7, 2023.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR442

Congratulating Matthew Stafford on leading the Los Angeles Rams to the 2022 Super Bowl championship.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR443

Recognizing February 28, 2023, as Rare Disease Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR444

Congratulating Sergeant Jack Doraty of the Galveston Police Department on being named Officer of the Year by the Rotary Club of Galveston.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR445

In memory of former University of Texas baseball coach Clifford Lincoln Gustafson.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR446

Congratulating Fernando Manuel Madrid on his retirement from the San Elizario ISD Board of Trustees.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR447

Recognizing the White Ranch as the oldest Anglo-owned cattle ranch in continuous operation in Southeast Texas.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR448

Commemorating the 100th anniversary of Tom Sefcik Hall.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR449

Commending Temple Community Clinic for 30 years of service to the community.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR45

Recognizing the Ibn Sina Foundation for its work in the Greater Houston area.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR450

Recognizing March 22, 2023, as Hindu New Year.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR451

Honoring Dr. Laura Nietfeld of San Antonio as Physician of the Day on March 10, 2023.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records