Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR615

In memory of John Richard Orr of Clint.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR616

Congratulating San Elizario on being named Best Historic Small Town in the USA Today 2023 Readers' Choice Awards.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR617

Congratulating David Cabrera on his retirement as assistant chief of the DPS Intelligence and Counterterrorism Division.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR618

Recognizing March 22, 2023, as Val Verde County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR619

Recognizing March 23, 2023, as Fairfield Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR62

Recognizing January 26, 2023, as Howard County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR620

In memory of Dr. Harmon Watson Kelley of San Antonio.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR621

Recognizing March 22, 2023, as Buda Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR622

Congratulating Joanne Justice on her selection as the 2022 REALTOR of the Year by Texas REALTORS.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR623

Recognizing April 2, 2023, as Education and Sharing Day in honor of Rabbi Menachem Schneerson.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR624

Recognizing April 12, 2023, as Port Aransas Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR625

Congratulating Ysmael D. Fonseca Jr. on his appointment to the 476th Judicial District Court in Hidalgo County.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR626

Congratulating the Lake Highlands High School boys' basketball team on winning the 2023 UIL 6A state championship.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR627

In memory of cumbia legend Fito Olivares of Houston.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR628

Commending the Dallas Wings organization for its contributions to the community.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records