Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate 2023 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR141

Recognizing Juandelle Wainscott Lacy Roberts of on the occasion of her 95th birthday.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR142

Recognizing February 7, 2023, as Habitat for Humanity Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR143

Recognizing the Endeavors Veteran Wellness Center for its service to disabled veterans and their families.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR144

Recognizing February 8, 2023, as Live Oak County Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR145

Recognizing February 6-8, 2023, as Midland-Odessa Days.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR146

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Sheriffs' Association of Texas Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR147

Congratulating Bobby Ott for being named Superintendent of the Year by the Texas Association of School Boards.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR148

Recognizing Opal Lee on the occasion of the unveiling of her portrait in the Senate Chamber.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR149

Recognizing 2023 as the Texas State Parks Centennial.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR15

In memory of Curtis Williams Mewbourne of Tyler.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR150

In memory of Tammy Ruth Armbruster.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR151

Recognizing February 16, 2023, as San Jacinto County Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR152

Recognizing Jennifer Jones on the occasion of her retirement.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR153

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Bastrop County Day.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR154

Recognizing February 23, 2023, as Liberty County Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records